EP4309566 - ANESTHETIC DEPTH INDICATION METHOD, DEVICE FOR PROMPTING ANESTHETIC DEPTH, AND ANESTHESIA MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Mindray Bio-Medical Electronics Co., Ltd. Floors 1-4, Mindray Building Keji 12th Road South Hi-tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAN, Congying Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
HUANGFU, Yong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LI, Xiang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | KIPA AB Drottninggatan 11 252 21 Helsingborg / SE | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 21931175.0 | 23.09.2021 | [2024/04] | WO2021CN120024 | Priority number, date | CN202110293071 | 18.03.2021 Original published format: CN202110293071 | [2024/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022193600 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4309566 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
A61B5/4821 (EP);
G16H20/17 (EP);
G16H20/40 (EP);
G16H40/63 (EP);
G16H50/50 (EP);
A61B5/083 (EP);
A61B5/087 (EP);
A61B5/0871 (EP);
A61B5/4839 (EP);
A61M16/01 (EP);
A61M16/024 (EP);
A61M2202/0241 (EP);
A61M2205/505 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/0241, A61M2202/0007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Title | German: | NARKOSETIEFENANZEIGEVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFFORDERUNG DER NARKOSETIEFE UND NARKOSEMASCHINE | [2024/04] | English: | ANESTHETIC DEPTH INDICATION METHOD, DEVICE FOR PROMPTING ANESTHETIC DEPTH, AND ANESTHESIA MACHINE | [2024/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D?INDICATION DE LA PROFONDEUR D?UNE ANESTHÉSIE, DISPOSITIF D?ALERTE DE PROFONDEUR D?ANESTHÉSIE ET MACHINE D?ANESTHÉSIE | [2024/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2023 | Translation filed | 17.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |