EP4198916 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.05.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rakuten Group, Inc. 1-14-1 Tamagawa P.O. Box 158-0094 Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0094 / JP | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLIYAPRAM, Vinayaraj 1580094 Tokyo / JP | 02 /
ANDERSON, Jeremiah 1580094 Tokyo / JP | 03 /
BANSAL, Mayank 1580094 Tokyo / JP | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21931922.5 | 15.10.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021JP38267 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023062825 | Date: | 20.04.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4198916 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.04.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/82, G06V20/13, // G06N3/045, G06N3/08, G06N20/00 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
G06N3/0464 (EP);
G06V10/776 (US);
G06N20/00 (EP);
G06N3/09 (EP);
G06N3/096 (EP);
G06V10/764 (US);
G06V10/766 (US);
G06V10/774 (US);
G06V10/82 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/25] | G06V10/82, G06V20/13, // G06N3/045, G06N3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2023/25] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2023/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2022 | Translation filed | 27.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 02.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 12.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US10755146 (JACOBS NATHAN [US], et al); | International search | [A]JP5406981B ; | [YA]US2016063516 (TERRAZAS ALEJANDRO [US], et al); | [A]WO2018051944 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [YA]JP2019179320 (PASCO CORP) |