EP4321285 - CUTTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 07.10.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Hardmetal Corp. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORISHIGE, Kazunori Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 02 /
NAKAKIHARA, Katsuya Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 21935922.1 | 05.04.2021 | [2024/07] | WO2021JP14488 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022215114 | Date: | 13.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4321285 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/10, B23C5/00 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
B23C5/109 (EP,US);
B23C5/006 (EP,US);
B23C2200/367 (EP);
B23C2210/168 (EP,US);
B23C2210/282 (EP,US);
B23C2250/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2024/07] | B23C5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Title | German: | SCHNEIDWERKZEUG | [2024/07] | English: | CUTTING TOOL | [2024/07] | French: | OUTIL DE COUPE | [2024/07] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2023 | Translation filed | 23.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 07.10.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US7399146 (LONG II THOMAS J [US], et al); | [Y]EP3088112 (TUNGALOY CORP [JP]); | [Y]WO2019163677 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]JPS61199314U ; | [A]JPH0179510U ; | [A]JPH04183512 (TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO LTD); | [A]JPH081426 (TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO LTD); | [A]JP2004510594 ; | [A]WO2005032776 (KENNAMETAL INC [US]); | [A]JP2014083629 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [A]WO2019030862 (OSG CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2019163677 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP2016190274 |