EP4322601 - TERMINAL, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMURA, Yuki Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
NAGATA, Satoshi Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 21935931.2 | 05.04.2021 | [2024/07] | WO2021JP14519 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022215123 | Date: | 13.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4322601 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, H04W36/16 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
H04W36/0088 (EP);
H04W36/0055 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT, DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND BASISSTATION | [2024/07] | English: | TERMINAL, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND BASE STATION | [2024/07] | French: | TERMINAL, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET STATION DE BASE | [2024/07] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2023 | Translation filed | 20.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2018173232 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0039], [0040], [0062], [0067] *; | [A]WO2018198342 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [A] 1-6* paragraphs [0028], [0100]-[0107] *; | [AT] - Sony, "Considerations on inter-cell operation", 3GPP Draft; R1-2100846, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), (20210119), XP051971198 [A] 1-6 * section 2.1 * [A] 1-6 [T] 1-6 |