EP4145603 - BATTERY AND POWER CONSUMING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian 352100 / CN | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Yu Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Peng Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
WU, Xiayi Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Xiang Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 05 /
LI, Zhenhua Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 06 /
LI, Xing Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Rowlands, Stuart Michael, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21937195.2 | 15.07.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021CN106458 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023283873 | Date: | 19.01.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4145603 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.01.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/20, H01M50/204, H01M10/04, H01M10/613, H01M10/615, H01M10/617, H01M10/625, H01M10/655, H01M50/244, H01M50/271 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H01M50/204 (EP,US);
H01M50/264 (KR);
H01M50/242 (US);
H01M10/16 (US);
H01M50/24 (EP,KR);
H01M50/244 (EP);
H01M50/271 (EP);
H01M50/291 (US);
H01M2220/20 (EP,KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/10] | H01M50/20, H01M50/204, H01M10/04, H01M10/613, H01M10/615, H01M10/617, H01M10/625, H01M10/655 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIE UND STROMVERBRAUCHENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/10] | English: | BATTERY AND POWER CONSUMING DEVICE | [2023/10] | French: | BATTERIE ET DISPOSITIF CONSOMMATEUR D'ÉNERGIE | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2022 | Translation filed | 25.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013244084 (AHN BYUNGKOOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]EP3790070 (CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |