EP4329089 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Dongjin Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Sungwon Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
HA, Jihun Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
KWON, Youngbae Seoul 06772 / KR | 05 /
JUNG, Byungwoon Seoul 06772 / KR | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Schornack, Oliver Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/09] | Schornack, Oliver Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21938001.1 | 22.04.2021 | [2024/09] | WO2021KR05092 | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022225083 | Date: | 27.10.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4329089 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H04M1/02, H01Q1/52, H01Q3/30, H01Q5/378, H01Q9/42, H01Q13/10, H01Q21/28, H04B7/0413, H04B7/06, H04B7/08 | [2024/39] | CPC: |
H04M1/026 (EP);
H01Q1/243 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q1/24 (US);
H01Q1/38 (KR);
H01Q1/52 (US);
H01Q1/521 (EP);
H01Q13/10 (EP);
H01Q21/061 (KR);
H01Q21/28 (EP);
H01Q5/378 (EP);
H01Q9/42 (EP);
H04B17/309 (KR);
H04B7/0413 (EP);
H04B7/0604 (EP,KR);
H04B7/0822 (EP,KR);
H04M1/0235 (KR);
H04M1/0268 (KR,US);
H05K1/0243 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2024/09] | H01Q1/24, H01Q1/38, H04M1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT ANTENNE | [2024/09] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING ANTENNA | [2024/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT UNE ANTENNE | [2024/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2023 | Translation filed | 20.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20190143029 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | International search | [A]KR20060053064 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]JP2011135175 (NEC CORP); | [A]KR20140105886 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20170037464 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20190143029 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |