EP4331316 - PACKETS RE-ROUTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Xiang Nanjing, Jiangsu 210000 / CN | 02 /
KOSKINEN, Henri Markus 02600 Espoo / FI | 03 /
MALKAMÄKI, Esa Mikael 02130 Espoo / FI | 04 /
LAITILA, Matti Einari 90650 Oulu / FI | 05 /
BLUME, Oliver 70499 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 21938323.9 | 28.04.2021 | [2024/10] | WO2021CN90563 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022226838 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4331316 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/19, H04W36/00 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H04W36/0033 (EP);
H04L47/825 (EP);
H04W40/22 (EP);
H04W40/34 (EP);
H04W76/12 (EP);
H04W76/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PAKETUMLEITUNG | [2024/10] | English: | PACKETS RE-ROUTING | [2024/10] | French: | RÉACHEMINEMENT DE PAQUETS | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN110536350 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2020195221 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-25* the whole document *; | [X] - Huawei, "(TP for NR_IAB BL CR for TS38.401): IAB topology update", 3GPP Draft; R3-204251, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20200615), vol. RAN WG3, no. Online; 20200601 - 20200611, XP051898742 [X] 1-25 * section 8.2.x.1 * | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NG-RAN; Architecture description (Release 16)", 3GPP Standard; Technical Specification; 3GPP TS 38.401, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20210409), vol. RAN WG3, no. V16.5.0, pages 1 - 79, XP052000761 [X] 1-25 * section 8.2.3.1 * | [X] - CATT, "Correction on DL RRC MESSAGE TRANSFER", 3GPP Draft; R3-204095, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20200615), vol. RAN WG3, no. E-meeting; 20200601 - 20200611, XP051898602 [X] 1-25 * section 8.2.x.1 * |