EP4325136 - AIR CONDITIONER AND DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD BASED ON POWER LINE COMMUNICATION THEREFOR, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Foshan Shunde Midea Electric Science and Technology Co., Ltd. Zone B, No. 8, Xinye 4th Road, Pioneer Park Shunjiang Neighborhood Committee, Beijiao, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528300 / CN | For all designated states GD Midea Air-Conditioning Equipment Co., Ltd. Midea Refrigeration Research Institute No. 22 Lingang Road, Beijiao, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Chengli Foshan, Guangdong 528300 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Wujun Foshan, Guangdong 528300 / CN | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 21938842.8 | 17.09.2021 | [2024/08] | WO2021CN119021 | Priority number, date | CN202110482458 | 30.04.2021 Original published format: CN202110482458 | [2024/08] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022227378 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4325136 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/50, F24F11/64, F24F1/22, F24F11/63, F24F11/30, F24F11/56, H04B3/54 | [2024/33] | CPC: |
H04B3/54 (EP,CN,US);
F24F11/50 (CN);
F24F11/56 (EP,US);
F24F1/22 (CN);
F24F11/30 (EP);
F24F11/63 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/08] | F24F11/50, F24F11/64, F24F1/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGE UND DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN AUF DER BASIS VON STROMLEITUNGSKOMMUNIKATION DAFÜR SOWIE SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2024/08] | English: | AIR CONDITIONER AND DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD BASED ON POWER LINE COMMUNICATION THEREFOR, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2024/08] | French: | CLIMATISEUR ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES FONDÉ SUR COMMUNICATION SUR LIGNE ÉLECTRIQUE, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2023 | Translation filed | 17.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |