EP4333562 - INDUCTION HEATING TYPE COOKTOP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWACK, Younghwan Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
SON, Seongho Seoul 08592 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Yongsoo Seoul 08592 / KR | 04 /
YANG, Jaekyung Seoul 08592 / KR | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 21939444.2 | 13.07.2021 | [2024/10] | WO2021KR08960 | Priority number, date | KR20210056714 | 30.04.2021 Original published format: KR 20210056714 | [2024/10] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022231065 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4333562 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/12, H05B6/06 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H05B6/065 (EP,US);
H05B6/1209 (KR);
H05B6/062 (KR);
H05B6/1245 (EP);
H05B6/1272 (US);
H05B2206/02 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | INDUKTIONSKOCHFELD | [2024/10] | English: | INDUCTION HEATING TYPE COOKTOP | [2024/10] | French: | TABLE DE CUISSON DE TYPE À CHAUFFAGE PAR INDUCTION | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2023 | Translation filed | 14.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2018225755 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JP2019067690 (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC); | [Y]KR102082507B ; | [YA]KR20200025929 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [Y]KR20200114433 (CUCHEN CO LTD [KR]) |