EP4335040 - DOPPLER SHIFT ESTIMATE REPORTING WITH PRE-COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Haitong Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Dawei Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 03 /
ZENG, Wei Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Yushu Beijing 100022 / CN | 05 /
YE, Chunxuan Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 06 /
CUI, Jie Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 07 /
NIU, Huaning Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Wardle, Callum Tarn Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2024/11] | Application number, filing date | 21939661.1 | 07.05.2021 | [2024/11] | WO2021CN91981 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022233013 | Date: | 10.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4335040 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0456 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
H04B7/063 (EP);
H04B7/01 (US);
H04B17/364 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Title | German: | DOPPLERVERSCHIEBUNGSSCHÄTZUNGSMELDUNG MIT VORKOMPENSATION | [2024/11] | English: | DOPPLER SHIFT ESTIMATE REPORTING WITH PRE-COMPENSATION | [2024/11] | French: | RAPPORT D'ESTIMATION DE DÉCALAGE DOPPLER AVEC PRÉ-COMPENSATION | [2024/11] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 15.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009312038 (GILDEA DAVID [US]); | [A]CN101980453 (SHANGHAI INST MICROSYS & INF, et al); | [A]CN103037425 (TD TECH LTD); | [A]WO2021008450 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); | [X]CN112514276 (FRAUNHOFER GES ZUR FORDERUNGDER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E V); | [A]CN112968746 (BEIJING GUODIAN GAOKE TECH CO LTD) |