EP4336876 - SERVER, TERMINAL, AND CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAGAWA Tetsuhiro Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
OOHARA Syunsuke Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
IIZUKA Yousuke Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
HASHIMOTO Kenji Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/11] | Application number, filing date | 21939856.7 | 07.05.2021 | [2024/11] | WO2021JP17547 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022234664 | Date: | 10.11.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4336876 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/20 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
H04W8/205 (EP);
H04W8/183 (EP);
H04W8/22 (EP);
H04W8/265 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Title | German: | SERVER, ENDGERÄT UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2024/11] | English: | SERVER, TERMINAL, AND CONTROL METHOD | [2024/11] | French: | SERVEUR, TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2024/11] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2023 | Translation filed | 29.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2010532107 (TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (PUBL)) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0022], [0026], [0030], fig. 3 *; | [A]JP2012147395 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0106], [0107], [0110], fig. 8 *; | [A]JP2020503740 (TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL)) [A] 1-7* paragraphs [0009], [0035] * |