EP4343769 - INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | 27.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATAOKA, Masahiro Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
NAGAURA, Ryohei Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
MOGUSHI, Kaoru Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 21940706.1 | 18.05.2021 | [2024/13] | WO2021JP18730 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022244089 | Date: | 24.11.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4343769 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.11.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G16B30/10 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
G16B30/10 (EP,US);
G06F16/13 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2024/13] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE | [2024/13] | French: | PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2023 | Translation filed | 15.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH0877177 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]WO2010086990 (SPIBER INC [JP], et al); | [YA]JP2015524658 ; | [YA]WO2020049748 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) | by applicant | WO2005096208 | JP2014112307 | WO2020049748 |