EP4241489 - METHODS, DEVICES AND SYSTEMS FOR REPORTING FREQUENCY OFFSET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEI, Meng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
JIANG, Chuangxin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LU, Zhaohua Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
GAO, Bo Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
WU, Hao Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 06 /
ZHANG, Shujuan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 21941232.7 | 11.05.2021 | [2023/37] | WO2021CN92972 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022236656 | Date: | 17.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4241489 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.11.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, H04L5/00 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04L5/005 (EP);
H04W76/19 (US);
H04W76/20 (US);
H04L5/0023 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/37] | H04W24/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNGEN UND SYSTEME ZUR MELDUNG VON FREQUENZVERSATZ | [2023/37] | English: | METHODS, DEVICES AND SYSTEMS FOR REPORTING FREQUENCY OFFSET | [2023/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, DISPOSITIFS ET SYSTÈMES DE RAPPORT DE DÉCALAGE DE FRÉQUENCE | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 25.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2021008432 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CO LTD RES INST [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 11; figure 4 *; | [A]US2021028843 (ZHOU HUA [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0342] , [0455] *; | [XI] - NOKIA ET AL, "Enhancements for HST-SFN deployment", vol. RAN WG1, no. e Meeting; 20201026 - 20201113, (20201101), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-2008907, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_103-e/Docs/R1-2008907.zip R1-2008907_M-TRP HST-SFN.docx, (20201101), XP052350839 [X] 1,2,13-15 * sections 1, 2.1, 2.2, 2.3;; figure 9 * [I] 3-12 | [A] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Enhancements on HST-SFN deployment", vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20201026 - 20201113, (20201101), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-2009254, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_103-e/Docs/R1-2009254.zip R1-2009254 Enhancements on HST-SFN deployment .docx, (20201101), XP052351174 [A] 1-15 * section 3.3.1;; figures 3-4 * | International search | [X]US2018323918 (CHUANG CHIAO-YAO [TW], et al) [X] 1-24 * claims 1-20,description,paragraph 56 *; | [A]CN109586880 (KT CORP) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]CN111096023 (APPLE INC) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]US2020205116 (ZHANG YUSHU [CN], et al) [A] 1-24* the whole document *; | [A]US2021006380 (ZHOU YAN [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2021008432 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CO LTD RES INST [CN], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A] - Intel Corporation, "Remaining Details on TRS", 3GPP Draft; R1-1716303 Remaining Details on TRS, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20170917), vol. RAN WG1, no. Nagoya, Japan; 20170918 - 20170921, XP051339759 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * |