EP4287673 - METHOD FOR INDICATING TRACKING AREA OF TERMINAL DEVICE AND NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Jingran Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
LU, Fei Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 03 /
LI, Haitao Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 21943601.1 | 05.06.2021 | [2023/49] | WO2021CN98501 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022252240 | Date: | 08.12.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4287673 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.12.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/14, H04W48/04, H04W76/32, // H04W60/04, H04W64/00 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
H04W8/14 (EP);
H04W8/02 (KR);
H04W76/10 (CN);
H04W60/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04L41/082 (CN);
H04W48/02 (KR);
H04W48/04 (EP);
H04W64/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04W64/003 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/49] | H04W8/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE DES VERFOLGUNGSBEREICHS EINER ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG | [2023/49] | English: | METHOD FOR INDICATING TRACKING AREA OF TERMINAL DEVICE AND NETWORK DEVICE | [2023/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INDICATION DE ZONE DE SUIVI DE DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU | [2023/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2023 | Translation filed | 29.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA3121287 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [Y]WO2021092504 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | International search | [A]US2012281531 (SUSITAIVAL RIIKKA [FI]); | [A]CN108934067 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN109548099 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN111246393 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN111866970 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN111866842 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CO LTD); | [X]CN112188471 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) |