EP4355041 - ELECTRICAL COMPONENT HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 04.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku / Yokohama-Shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | For all designated states RENAULT S.A.S. 122-122 bis, avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHII, Soichi Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Rei Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 03 /
KUBOTA, Yasuyuki Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 04 /
IIYAMA, Tadaaki Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 21944439.5 | 08.06.2021 | [2024/16] | WO2021IB00400 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022259006 | Date: | 15.12.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4355041 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.12.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H05K5/02, H05K7/20, H02M7/00, H05K7/14, H05K9/00 | [2024/29] | CPC: |
H05K7/20927 (EP,US);
H05K5/04 (US);
H02M7/003 (EP);
H05K7/1432 (EP);
H05K9/0039 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2024/16] | H05K5/02, H05K7/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE FÜR ELEKTRISCHE KOMPONENTEN | [2024/16] | English: | ELECTRICAL COMPONENT HOUSING | [2024/16] | French: | BOÎTIER POUR COMPOSANT ÉLECTRIQUE | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2023 | Translation filed | 12.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 12.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/16] | 04.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2688378 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]JP2016059242 (TOYOTA IND CORP); | [Y]WO2020169998 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) | International search | [Y]JPH10178151 (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON); | [A]JP2011233726 (KOJIMA PRESS IND CO LTD); | [Y]WO2012124074 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]CN104298327 (UNIV QIQIHAR); | [Y]JP2016059242 (TOYOTA IND CORP); | [Y]WO2019175928 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al); | [Y]CN211831654U (UNIV HUAZHONG SCIENCE TECH, et al) | by applicant | WO2019175928 |