EP4353092 - FLAVOR SOURCE-CONTAINING ROD COMPRISING CAP MEMBER AT TIP END [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | 15.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6927 / JP | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/16] | For all designated states Japan Tobacco, Inc. 1-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-6927 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBUICHI, Hiroshi Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 21945179.6 | 11.06.2021 | [2024/16] | WO2021JP22248 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022259505 | Date: | 15.12.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4353092 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24D1/20 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
D04H1/732 (EP,US);
A24D1/20 (EP,KR,US);
A24B13/00 (EP);
A24B15/12 (EP);
A24B15/28 (EP,KR);
A24C5/01 (EP);
A24D1/02 (KR);
D04H1/26 (EP,US);
D04H1/587 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Title | German: | AROMAQUELLENHALTIGE STANGE MIT KAPPENELEMENT AM SPITZENENDE | [2024/16] | English: | FLAVOR SOURCE-CONTAINING ROD COMPRISING CAP MEMBER AT TIP END | [2024/16] | French: | TIGE CONTENANT UNE SOURCE D'ARÔME COMPRENANT UN ÉLÉMENT DE CAPUCHON À L'EXTRÉMITÉ DE POINTE | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2023 | Translation filed | 05.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2001709 (GLENN DAVIDSON); | [YA]JP2019126290 (NIPPON PAPER PAPYLIA CO LTD); | [A]US2020077696 (WILLIAMS DWIGHT DAVID [US], et al) | by applicant | JP6227555B | WO2019111536 |