EP4352910 - A BLOCKCHAIN-BASED INSURANCE CLAIMS TRANSACTION PROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allogia, Anthony 2973 Frenchmens Passage Palm Beach Gardens FL 33410 / US | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 21945350.3 | 18.08.2021 | [2024/16] | WO2021US46425 | Priority number, date | US202163208355P | 08.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163208355 P | US202117400951 | 12.08.2021 Original published format: US202117400951 | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022260688 | Date: | 15.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4352910 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
G06Q40/08 (EP,US);
G06Q20/065 (EP);
G06Q20/102 (EP);
G06Q20/401 (US);
G06Q20/389 (EP);
G06Q2220/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON BLOCKCHAIN-BASIERTEN VERSICHERUNGSANSPRUCHSTRANSAKTIONEN | [2024/16] | English: | A BLOCKCHAIN-BASED INSURANCE CLAIMS TRANSACTION PROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2024/16] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE TRANSACTIONS DE DÉCLARATIONS DE SINISTRE BASÉ SUR DES CHAÎNES DE BLOCS | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/16] | 26.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2019057454 (KOMENDA ARKADIUSZ [US], et al); | [Y]US2020394715 (INDERMAUR KURT [US]); | [A]US2020410590 (REGMI PUSKER [US], et al) |