EP4362343 - TERMINAL, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBAIKE, Naoya Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMURA, Yuki Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
ECHIGO, Haruhi Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
NAGATA, Satoshi Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 21947202.4 | 25.06.2021 | [2024/18] | WO2021JP24192 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022269920 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4362343 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0426 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
H04B7/0404 (EP);
H04B7/0426 (EP);
H04W52/04 (EP);
H04W52/146 (EP);
H04W52/16 (EP);
H04W52/325 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT, DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND BASISSTATION | [2024/18] | English: | TERMINAL, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND BASE STATION | [2024/18] | French: | TERMINAL, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET STATION DE BASE | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2024 | Translation filed | 11.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AY]JP2010506494 ; | [AY]JP2010520711 ; | [YX]JP2013524584 |