EP4343643 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, PROGRAM, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU Jikang Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 21948285.8 | 29.06.2021 | [2024/13] | WO2021JP24512 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023275976 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4343643 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.01.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/09, G06N3/0442, // G06N5/01, G06N20/20 | [2024/32] | CPC: |
G06N3/0442 (EP);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N3/09 (EP);
G06N20/20 (EP);
G06N5/01 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2024/13] | G06N20/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, PROGRAMM UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2024/13] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, PROGRAM, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD | [2024/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROGRAMME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2023 | Translation filed | 12.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2018073349 (YAHOO JAPAN CORP); | [A]JP2019040475 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JP2020194414 (HITACHI LTD); | by applicant | JP2019040475 |