EP4404405 - CABLE PATHWAY SEALING SYSTEM AND INSTALLATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ildeung International 1st Floor, 8-7 Saneop-ro 85beon-gil Nam-gu, Ulsan 44775 / KR | [2024/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Yeonjin Ulsan 44740 / KR | [2024/30] | Representative(s) | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Denninger Str. 169 81925 München / DE | [2024/30] | Application number, filing date | 21950373.7 | 09.12.2021 | [2024/30] | WO2021KR18609 | Priority number, date | KR20210124856 | 17.09.2021 Original published format: KR 20210124856 | [2024/30] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023042967 | Date: | 23.03.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4404405 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02G9/06, H02G9/10, F16L5/02, H01B7/36 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
F16L5/02 (EP);
F16L5/08 (EP);
H02G9/06 (EP);
H02G9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KABELWEGABDICHTUNGSSYSTEM UND INSTALLATIONSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2024/30] | English: | CABLE PATHWAY SEALING SYSTEM AND INSTALLATION METHOD THEREFOR | [2024/30] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ DE PASSAGE DE CÂBLE ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSTALLATION CORRESPONDANT | [2024/30] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2023 | Translation filed | 27.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2023 | Examination requested [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR860700242 ; | [A]KR19990006596U ; | [Y]JP2003139893 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]KR20090002674U ; | [YA]KR101777819B (KIM YUN JIN [KR], et al) |