EP4377729 - OPTICAL FIBERS COMPRISING TRIANGULAR TRENCH PROFILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | 27.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OFS FITEL LLC 2000 Northeast Expressway Norcross, GA 30071 / US | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAGANZA, David D. Southbridge, MA 01566 / US | 02 /
KLEIN, Alan A. Duluth, GA 30096 / US | 03 /
PECKHAM, David W. Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 21952061.6 | 26.07.2021 | [2024/23] | WO2021US43225 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023009103 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4377729 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/02, G02B6/028, G02B6/036, H04B10/00 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
G02B6/03627 (EP);
G02B6/0285 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE FASERN MIT DREIECKIGEM GRABENPROFIL | [2024/23] | English: | OPTICAL FIBERS COMPRISING TRIANGULAR TRENCH PROFILE | [2024/23] | French: | FIBRES OPTIQUES COMPRENANT UN PROFIL DE TRANCHÉE TRIANGULAIRE | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2003035638 (MOZDY RACHEL S [US], et al); | [Y]US2016304392 (BOOKBINDER DANA CRAIG [US], et al); | [YA]US2018120503 (BENNETT KEVIN WALLACE [US], et al); | [YA]US2020319398 (DE MONTMORILLON LOUIS-ANNE [FR], et al) |