EP4371834 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING DIRECTION FOR PULLING OUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Junxia Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
SHI, Chang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
HU, Wenxiao Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 21952176.2 | 03.08.2021 | [2024/21] | WO2021CN110214 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023010267 | Date: | 09.02.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4371834 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.02.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B62D15/02, G08G1/0968, G08G1/14 | [2024/41] | CPC: |
B62D15/0285 (EP);
B60W30/06 (US);
B60W50/14 (US);
B60W60/0015 (US);
B60W60/0021 (US);
B62D15/027 (EP);
G08G1/096838 (EP);
G08G1/09685 (EP);
G08G1/096861 (EP);
G08G1/096888 (EP);
G08G1/143 (EP);
G08G1/147 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/21] | B60W30/06, G08G1/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER RICHTUNG ZUM HERAUSZIEHEN | [2024/21] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING DIRECTION FOR PULLING OUT | [2024/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER UNE DIRECTION DE SORTIE DE STATIONNEMENT | [2024/21] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2024 | Translation filed | 12.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |