EP4393119 - NETWORK NODE, USER EQUIPMENT AND METHODS IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAMMI, Sairamesh Austin, Texas 78717 / US | 02 /
LIDIAN, Namir 171 49 Solna / SE | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 21955192.6 | 25.08.2021 | [2024/27] | WO2021SE50821 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023027615 | Date: | 02.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4393119 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02, H04B1/10, H04B17/345 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
H04L25/0224 (EP);
H04W72/1268 (US);
H04J11/005 (EP);
H04L5/0051 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/541 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NETZWERKKNOTEN, BENUTZERGERÄT UND VERFAHREN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2024/27] | English: | NETWORK NODE, USER EQUIPMENT AND METHODS IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2024/27] | French: | NOEUD DE RÉSEAU, ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET PROCÉDÉS DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2024/27] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014321313 (SEO HANBYUL [KR], et al); | [Y]WO2018044715 (INTEL IP CORP [US], et al); | [Y]WO2018230735 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); | [A]EP3651398 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]US2020153590 (KO HYUNSOO [KR], et al); |