EP4202938 - MEMORY, OPERATING METHOD THEREFOR, AND MEMORY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yangtze Memory Technologies Co., Ltd. No.88 Weilai 3rd Road, East Lake High-tech Development Zone Wuhan, Hubei 430000 / CN | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Xiaojiang Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21955369.0 | 30.08.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021CN115475 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023028790 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4202938 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.03.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/16, G11C16/26, G11C8/12, G11C16/34, G11C16/32, G11C5/02, G11C29/02 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
G11C16/10 (EP,KR);
G11C11/5628 (EP,KR);
G06F3/0604 (CN);
G11C16/102 (US);
G06F3/0629 (CN);
G06F3/0671 (CN);
G11C16/0483 (EP,KR);
G11C16/08 (EP,KR,US);
G11C16/32 (EP,KR);
G11C16/3459 (EP,KR,US);
G11C8/12 (EP);
G11C29/08 (EP);
G11C5/025 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/26] | G11C16/26, G11C16/16, G06F3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEICHER, BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND SPEICHERSYSTEM | [2023/26] | English: | MEMORY, OPERATING METHOD THEREFOR, AND MEMORY SYSTEM | [2023/26] | French: | MÉMOIRE, PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT ASSOCIÉ, ET SYSTÈME DE MÉMOIRE | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2023 | Translation filed | 23.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 05.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2018203774 (SRINIVASAN CHARAN [US], et al); | [A]US2020090770 (YANG XIANG [US], et al); | [A]US2021264980 (SAGRON ITAY [IL], et al); | [A]US2021264994 (DENG JIALIANG [CN], et al) |