EP4398527 - MODEL PROCESSING METHOD, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, NETWORK DEVICE, AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Wendong Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 21955488.8 | 02.09.2021 | [2024/28] | WO2021CN116244 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023028948 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4398527 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02, H04B7/0413 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
H04B7/0626 (EP,US);
H04B7/0639 (US);
H04B7/0456 (EP);
H04B7/0658 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODELLVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2024/28] | English: | MODEL PROCESSING METHOD, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, NETWORK DEVICE, AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2024/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE MODÈLE, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2024/28] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2024 | Translation filed | 07.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |