EP4344910 - DEHUMIDIFICATION MODE CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS, DEVICE, MEDIUM, AND PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 24.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Geely Holding Group Co., Ltd. 1760 Jiangling Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | For all designated states Geely Automobile Research Institute (Ningbo) Co., Ltd No. 818, Binhai 2nd Road Hangzhou Bay New District Ningbo, Zhejiang 315336 / CN | [2024/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Shuangqi Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | [2024/14] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [2024/14] | Application number, filing date | 21961958.2 | 29.10.2021 | [2024/14] | WO2021CN127729 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023070606 | Date: | 04.05.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4344910 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.05.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, B60H1/22, B60H1/32, F25B30/02, B60H1/14 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
B60H1/143 (EP);
B60H1/3207 (EP,KR);
B60H1/00899 (EP);
B60H1/2218 (KR);
B60H1/2221 (KR);
F25B49/005 (EP);
B60H2001/00949 (EP);
B60H2001/3245 (EP,KR);
B60H2001/3255 (KR);
B60H2001/327 (KR);
B60H2001/3285 (KR);
F25B2700/02 (EP);
F25B30/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/14] | B60H1/00, B60H1/22, B60H1/32, F25B30/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES ENTFEUCHTUNGSMODUS, VORRICHTUNG, MEDIUM UND PROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2024/14] | English: | DEHUMIDIFICATION MODE CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS, DEVICE, MEDIUM, AND PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2024/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE MODE DE DÉSHUMIDIFICATION, DISPOSITIF, SUPPORT ET PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME | [2024/14] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2023 | Translation filed | 29.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/14] | 21.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US10173491 (KIM JAE YEON [KR]); | [A]US2019351739 (KIM JONG WON [KR], et al); | [A]US2019366800 (DURRANI NAVID [DE], et al); | [A]WO2021192760 (SANDEN AUTOMOTIVE CLIMATE SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) |