EP4089261 - SHAPED PROFILE FOR FACADE PROFILES BASED ON WOOD OR PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wieden s.r.o. Malodoubská 355/6 460 08 Liberec VIII-Dolní Hanychov / CZ | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rehák, Jakub 460 15 Liberec XV / CZ | 02 /
Wieden, Pavel 460 15 Liberec XV / CZ | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Kolator, Kamil Dobiásova 1246/29 460 06 Liberec VI - Rochlice / CZ | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 22020166.9 | 12.04.2022 | [2022/46] | Priority number, date | CZ20210003880 | 11.05.2021 Original published format: CZ 20213880 | [2022/46] | Filing language | CS | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4089261 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E06B7/14, E04B2/96 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
E06B7/14 (EP);
E04B2/96 (EP);
E04C1/39 (CZ);
E06B2007/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] |
Former [2022/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORMPROFIL FÜR FASSADENPROFILE BASIEREND AUF HOLZ ODER PAPIER | [2022/46] | English: | SHAPED PROFILE FOR FACADE PROFILES BASED ON WOOD OR PAPER | [2022/46] | French: | PROFILÉ FORMÉ POUR PROFILS DE FAÇADE À BASE DE BOIS OU DE PAPIER | [2022/46] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 07.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0115601 (HELD KURT) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * page 6 - page 8 *; | [X]US2004206025 (PANTO GIORGIO [IT]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0029] , [0030] , [0035] , [0049] , [0050] , [0052] , [0060] , [0061] , [0062] , [0063] , [0078] *; | [A]WO2010063297 (MENCK FENSTER GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure 4 ** page 18, line 28 - page 19, line 2 *; | [A]US2016108658 (CRUYSBERGHS RINGO [BE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0053] * |