EP4230426 - SECURITY ELEMENT TRANSFER MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 161 81677 München / DE | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schinabeck, Josef 83708 Kreuth / DE | 02 /
Teufel, Björn 83700 Weißach / DE | 03 /
Rauch, Andreas 82441 Ohlstadt / DE | 04 /
Sattler, Tobias 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Giesecke+Devrient IP Prinzregentenstraße 161 81677 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/34] | Giesecke + Devrient IP Prinzregentenstraße 161 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22020540.5 | 08.11.2022 | [2023/34] | Priority number, date | DE20221000409 | 03.02.2022 Original published format: DE102022000409 | [2023/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4230426 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/324, B42D25/328, B42D25/351, B42D25/373, B42D25/435, B42D25/44, B42D25/445, B42D25/455, B42D25/46, B42D25/47 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
B42D25/324 (EP);
B41M3/14 (CN);
B41M1/30 (CN);
B41M3/12 (CN);
B41M5/03 (CN);
B41M5/42 (CN);
B42D25/328 (EP);
B42D25/351 (EP);
B42D25/373 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] |
Former [2023/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSELEMENT-TRANSFERMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN DESSELBEN | [2023/34] | English: | SECURITY ELEMENT TRANSFER MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2023/34] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE TRANSFERT D'ÉLÉMENTS DE SÉCURITÉ ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/34] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/14] | 23.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102013108906 (OVD KINEGRAM AG [CH]); | [ID]DE102016009318 (GIESECKE+DEVRIENT CURRENCY TECH GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE102016009318 |