EP4001371 - A COATING COMPOSITION COMPRISING A HIGH MN POLYESTER AND A LOW MN POLYESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Coatings (Zhangjiagang) Company Ltd. No. 21 Donghai Road Yangtze Jiang International Chemical Industrial Park Zhangjiagang / CN | [2024/24] |
Former [2022/21] | For all designated states PPG Packaging Coatings (Suzhou) Co. Ltd. 66 Xiangyang Road Suzhou New District Jiangsu 215011 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAN, Cunyi 215006 Suzhou / CN | 02 /
WANG, Shimin Suzhou Jiangsu 215100 / CN | 03 /
HAN, Feng Suzhou Jiangsu 215009 / CN | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 22150184.4 | 05.11.2015 | [2022/21] | Priority number, date | CN201410619339 | 05.11.2014 Original published format: CN201410619339 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4001371 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09D167/02, B65D25/14 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
B65D25/14 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C09D167/02 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C09D167/00 (CN);
B05D7/24 (KR);
B05D7/52 (KR);
B65D65/42 (EP,KR,US);
C09D127/06 (CN,KR);
C09D7/63 (CN);
C09D7/65 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C09D127/06, C08L91/00, C08K5/42 (CN);
C09D167/00, C08L67/00, C08L61/06, C08L91/00, C08K5/10 (CN);
C09D167/02, C08L67/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] |
Former [2022/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT POLYESTER MIT HOHEM MN UND POLYESTER MIT NIEDRIGEM MN | [2022/21] | English: | A COATING COMPOSITION COMPRISING A HIGH MN POLYESTER AND A LOW MN POLYESTER | [2022/21] | French: | COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT COMPRENANT UN POLYESTER DE MN ÉLEVÉ ET UN POLYESTER DE MN FAIBLE | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 24.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15795299.5 / EP3215579 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004013240 (VALSPAR SOURCING INC [US], et al); | [I]US2007036903 (MAYR PETER [AT], et al) |