EP4002123 - METHOD AND SYSTEMS FOR RESTARTING A FLIGHT CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIERCE, David Barnard Kentwood, 49512 / US | 02 /
JANSEN, Justin Hudsonville, 49426 / US | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 22150669.4 | 25.09.2009 | [2022/21] | Priority number, date | US20080242357 | 30.09.2008 Original published format: US 242357 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4002123 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4002123 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/16, G06F11/14 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
G06F11/1666 (EP,US);
G06F11/1438 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] |
Former [2022/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUM NEUSTARTEN EINES FLUGSTEUERUNGSSYSTEMS | [2022/21] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEMS FOR RESTARTING A FLIGHT CONTROL SYSTEM | [2022/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈMES DE REDÉMARRAGE D'UN CIRCUIT DE COMMANDES DE VOL | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 21.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09171333.9 / EP2172843 | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | IT | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | IE | 25.09.2023 | LU | 25.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
IE | 25.09.2023 | ||
LU | 25.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
IE | 25.09.2023 | ||
LU | 25.09.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 25.09.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 25.09.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5363502 (KAGIMASA TOYOHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, lines 23-65 * * column 6, lines 20-25 * * column 8, lines 53-63 * * column 9, lines 33-40 *; | [A]US6195695 (CHESTON RICHARD W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 6-18 * * column 1, lines 47-65 * * column 2, lines 17-24 * * column 4, lines 44-49 ** claim 1 *; | [A]WO02073505 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] - [0014] - [0031] , [0036] - [0040] - [0042] , [0043] , [0045]; figure 2; claims 1,3 *; | [A]US6665813 (FORSMAN STEPHANIE MARIA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 30-41 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 4 * * column 3, lines 32-34 * * column 4, lines 18-42 * * column 5, lines 44-56 * * claim 11 *; | [A]US6970890 (BRUCE RICARDO H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, lines 23-35 * * column 4, lines 43-48 * * column 5, lines 37-48 * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2007005790 (SLING MEDIA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0019] , [0021] - [0023] - [0027] , [0029] , [0040] , [0048] , [0053] * |