EP4029978 - ROTOR SPINNING DEVICE SELF-CLEANING STRUCTURE, TEXTILE MACHINE AND SELF-CLEANING OPERATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/29] | ROTOR SPINNING DEVICE SELF-CLEANING STRUCTURE, TEXTILE MACHINERY AND SELF-CLEANING OPERATION METHOD | ||
[2024/26] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saurer (Jiangsu) Textile Machinery Co. Ltd. No. 558 Huixian Middle Road Jintan District Changzhou City, Jiangsu Province 213200 / CN | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kistner, Alexander 63179 Obertshausen / DE | 02 /
Qu, Hongmin Suzhou / CN | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Morgenthum-Neurode, Mirko Saurer Spinning Solutions GmbH & Co. KG Patentabteilung Carlstraße 60 52531 Übach-Palenberg / DE | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 22150970.6 | 11.01.2022 | [2022/29] | Priority number, date | CN20211070207 | 19.01.2021 Original published format: CN202110070207 | [2022/29] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029978 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4029978 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D01H4/08, D01H4/24 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
D01H4/24 (EP,CN);
D01H4/08 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] |
Former [2022/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SELBSTREINIGENDE STRUKTUR EINER ROTORSPINNVORRICHTUNG, TEXTILMASCHINE UND SELBSTREINIGENDES BETRIEBSVERFAHREN | [2022/29] | English: | ROTOR SPINNING DEVICE SELF-CLEANING STRUCTURE, TEXTILE MACHINE AND SELF-CLEANING OPERATION METHOD | [2024/26] | French: | STRUCTURE AUTONETTOYANTE DE DISPOSITIF DE FILATURE À ROTOR, MACHINE TEXTILE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT AUTONETTOYANT | [2022/29] |
Former [2022/29] | ROTOR SPINNING DEVICE SELF-CLEANING STRUCTURE, TEXTILE MACHINERY AND SELF-CLEANING OPERATION METHOD | Examination procedure | 12.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 20.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]GB1142923 (SCHUBERT & SALZER MASCHINEN); | [Y]US5609015 (RAASCH HANS [DE], et al); | [A]DE102016009278 (SAURER GERMANY GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]US2020199789 (KUEBLER MARKUS [DE], et al) | by applicant | DE10023148 |