EP4050440 - A SMART PROGRAMMING METHOD FOR INTEGRATED CNC-ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Bin Beijing, 102218 / CN | 02 /
ROUX, Armin 91052 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
HU, Ye Beijing, 102206 / CN | 04 /
FAN, Shun Jie Beijing, 100102 / CN | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 22151350.0 | 13.01.2022 | [2022/35] | Priority number, date | CN202110211608 | 25.02.2021 Original published format: CN202110211608 | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4050440 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/409, G05B19/425, B25J9/16 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
G05B19/409 (EP);
G06F8/34 (CN);
G05B19/4069 (US);
B25J9/1656 (EP);
G05B19/4063 (US);
G05B19/425 (EP);
G06F8/38 (CN);
G06T13/00 (CN);
G05B2219/32351 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] |
Former [2022/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTES PROGRAMMIERVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN INTEGRIERTEN CNC-ROBOTER | [2022/35] | English: | A SMART PROGRAMMING METHOD FOR INTEGRATED CNC-ROBOT | [2022/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PROGRAMMATION INTELLIGENTE POUR ROBOT CNC INTÉGRÉ | [2022/35] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 28.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2016053337 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0042] *; | [A]US2017235300 (MARUNO RYOTA [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0123] ** paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0055] * |