EP4036162 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING OLEFINIC RESIN POROUS MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prime Planet Energy & Solutions, Inc. 2-1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0022 / JP | For all designated states Fukuoka Institute Of Technology 3-30-1 Wajiro-higashi Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 811-0295 / JP | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUNOBU, Kohei Tokyo, 103-0022 / JP | 02 /
MATSUYAMA, Kiyoshi Fukuoka, 811-0295 / JP | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 22151591.9 | 14.01.2022 | [2022/31] | Priority number, date | JP20210012984 | 29.01.2021 Original published format: JP 2021012984 | [2022/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4036162 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/12 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
C08J9/122 (EP,CN,US);
C08J9/08 (KR);
B01J3/008 (US);
C08J2203/06 (EP,CN);
C08J2203/08 (CN);
C08J2323/04 (US);
C08J2323/06 (EP,CN,KR);
C08J2323/10 (US);
C08J2323/12 (EP,CN,KR);
Y02P20/54 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PORÖSEM MATERIAL AUS OLEFINISCHEM HARZ | [2022/31] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING OLEFINIC RESIN POROUS MATERIAL | [2022/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MATÉRIAU POREUX DE RÉSINE OLÉFINIQUE | [2022/31] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 14.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US4464484 (YOSHIMURA SHOHEI [JP], et al) [X] 5-8 * example - * [A] 1-4 [I] 5-8; | [XAI]US2011305940 (USAMI YASUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 5-8 * example 1 * [A] 1-4 [I] 5-8; | [XAI]CN112210113 (UNIV EAST CHINA SCIENCE & TECH) [X] 5-8 * example 1 * [A] 1-4[I] 5-8 | by applicant | JPH06104736B | JP2009527633 | JP2016176061 |