EP4049772 - CHAMBER SYSTEMS FOR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seurat Technologies, Inc. 265 Ballardvale St. Wilmington, MA 01887 / US | [2023/35] |
Former [2022/35] | For all designated states Seurat Technologies, Inc. 1060 La Avenida St. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMUTH, James, A. Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
TOOMRE, Erik Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 03 /
LEARD, Francis, L. Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 04 /
KAMSHAD, Kourosh Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 05 /
FEES, Heiner Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 06 /
BERDICHEVSKY, Eugene Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 22151728.7 | 27.10.2016 | [2022/35] | Priority number, date | US201562248799P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248799 P | US201562248980P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248980 P | US201562248839P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248839 P | US201562248770P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248770 P | US201562248989P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248989 P | US201562248848P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248848 P | US201562248780P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248780 P | US201562248791P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248791 P | US201562248795P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248795 P | US201562248833P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248833 P | US201562248966P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248966 P | US201562248765P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248765 P | US201562248829P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248829 P | US201562248969P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248969 P | US201562248787P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248787 P | US201562248968P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248968 P | US201562248776P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248776 P | US201562248821P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248821 P | US201562248847P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248847 P | US201562248835P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248835 P | US201562248758P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248758 P | US201562248841P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248841 P | US201562248783P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248783 P | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4049772 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B22F/ | [2022/35] | CPC: |
B23K37/0408 (EP,IL,US);
B22F10/28 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
B29C64/268 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
B29C64/264 (IL,US);
B22F10/00 (IL,US);
B22F10/10 (IL,US);
B22F10/34 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
B22F10/36 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
B22F10/38 (KR);
B22F10/39 (EP,KR);
B22F10/47 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B22F10/50 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B22F10/70 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
B22F10/85 (KR);
B22F12/00 (US);
B22F12/17 (EP,CN,IL,US);
B22F12/222 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B22F12/226 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B22F12/30 (EP,IL,US);
B22F12/33 (IL,KR,US);
B22F12/38 (IL,KR,US);
B22F12/44 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B22F12/53 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B22F12/70 (IL,KR,US);
B22F12/88 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B22F12/90 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
B22F3/24 (IL,US);
B23K15/0006 (EP,IL,US);
B23K15/0013 (EP,IL,US);
B23K15/002 (EP,IL,US);
B23K15/0026 (EP,IL,US);
B23K15/0086 (EP,IL,US);
B23K15/0093 (EP,IL,US);
B23K15/06 (EP,IL,US);
B23K26/0006 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B23K26/03 (EP,IL,US);
B23K26/032 (EP,IL,US);
B23K26/082 (EP,IL,US);
B23K26/083 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B23K26/0846 (IL,US);
B23K26/1224 (EP,IL,US);
B23K26/123 (EP,IL,US);
B23K26/127 (EP,IL,US);
B23K26/142 (IL,US);
B23K26/144 (IL,US);
B23K26/16 (IL,US);
B23K26/342 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B23K26/36 (IL,US);
B23K26/702 (IL,US);
B23K26/703 (EP,IL,US);
B23K26/704 (EP,IL,US);
B23K37/0426 (IL,US);
B25J11/00 (IL,US);
B28B1/001 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
B29C64/153 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B29C64/286 (KR);
B29C64/35 (EP,CN,IL);
B29C64/357 (EP,CN,IL);
B29C64/379 (EP,CN,IL);
B29C64/386 (IL,US);
B29C64/393 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
B33Y10/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B33Y40/00 (EP,CN,IL,US);
B33Y50/02 (EP,CN,IL,US);
B33Y70/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B33Y80/00 (IL,US);
B33Y99/00 (IL,US);
G02B15/04 (IL,US);
G02B15/10 (IL,US);
G02B19/0028 (IL,US);
G02B19/0047 (IL,KR,US);
G02B26/0816 (IL,US);
G02B27/0068 (IL,US);
G02B27/0905 (EP,IL,US);
G02B27/141 (IL,US);
G02B27/283 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G02B27/286 (EP,IL,US);
G02B7/14 (IL,US);
G02B7/16 (IL,US);
G02B7/1827 (IL,US);
G02F1/0136 (EP,IL,US);
G02F1/133362 (IL,US);
G02F1/135 (IL,US);
G05B17/02 (IL,US);
G07C3/146 (EP,IL,US);
H01S5/005 (IL,KR,US);
H01S5/4012 (IL,US);
B22F10/32 (EP,IL,US);
B22F10/64 (EP,IL,US);
B22F10/73 (EP,IL,US);
B22F12/20 (EP,IL,US);
B22F12/41 (EP,IL,US);
B22F12/45 (EP,IL,US);
B22F2003/247 (IL,KR,US);
B22F2003/248 (IL,KR,US);
B22F2203/03 (IL);
B22F2998/10 (IL,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,CN,IL,US);
B23K2101/001 (IL,US);
B23K2101/008 (EP,IL,US);
B23K2101/02 (IL,US);
B23K2101/24 (IL,US);
B23K2103/00 (EP,IL,US);
B23K2103/42 (EP,IL,US);
B23K2103/50 (EP,IL,US);
B29K2105/251 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G02B27/108 (US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F10/00, B22F2203/03 (US);
B22F2999/00, B22F10/20, B22F2203/03 (US);
B22F2999/00, B22F12/41, B22F2203/03 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] |
Former [2022/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTÈMES DE CHAMBRES POUR FABRICATION ADDITIVE | [2022/35] | English: | CHAMBER SYSTEMS FOR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING | [2022/35] | French: | KAMMERSYSTEME ZUR ADDITIVEN FERTIGUNG | [2022/35] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 08.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16860837.0 / EP3368235 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0856393 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]US2001045678 (KUBO NAOKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2005263932 (HEUGEL MARTIN [DE]); | [Y]US2010262272 (SHKOLNIK ALEXANDR [US], et al); | [Y]EP2583785 (PRATT & WHITNEY ROCKETDYNE INC [US]); | [Y]US2014252687 (EL-DASHER BASSEM S [US], et al); | [Y]EP2778780 (CHRISTIE DIGITAL SYS CA INC [CA]); | [Y]WO2015086705 (EXMET AB [SE]); | [Y]US2015165556 (JONES MARSHALL GORDON [US], et al) |