EP4033653 - CASCADED MULTICELL CONVERTER WITH 3-POLE H-BRIDGES WITH SPLIT DC CAPACITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinland-Pfälzische Technische Universität Kaiserslautern-Landau Körperschaft des öffentlichen Rechts Gottlieb-Daimler-Straße 47 67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | [2024/01] |
Former [2022/30] | For all designated states Technische Universität Kaiserslautern Paul-Ehrlich-Str. Gebäude 32 67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fang, Jingyang 67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | 02 /
Götz, Stefan 67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei Vièl & Wieske PartGmbB Feldmannstraße 110 66119 Saarbrücken / DE | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 22152197.4 | 19.01.2022 | [2022/30] | Priority number, date | DE202110101261 | 21.01.2021 Original published format: DE102021101261 | [2022/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4033653 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/483, // H02M1/32 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
H02M7/4835 (EP);
H02M1/327 (EP);
H02M7/4833 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] |
Former [2022/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KASKADIERTER MULTIZELLENUMRICHTER MIT 3-POLIGEN H-BRÜCKEN MIT GETEILTEM ZWISCHENKREISKONDENSATOR | [2022/30] | English: | CASCADED MULTICELL CONVERTER WITH 3-POLE H-BRIDGES WITH SPLIT DC CAPACITOR | [2022/30] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR MULTI-CELLULE EN CASCADE AVEC DES PONTS H AVEC TRIPOLE ET DES CONDENSATEURS DIVISÉS | [2022/30] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 26.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017025866 (GOETZ STEFAN [DE]); | by applicant | US799 | US9496 | US3867643 | DE10103031 | US8890465 | US9502960 | US2018013339 | US10218189 | US10442309 | DE102019006476 |