EP4215665 - DEVICE FOR TREATING TEXTILES WITH A LIQUID AND METHOD FOR TREATING TEXTILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benninger AG Fabrikstrasse CH-9240 Uzwil / CH | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIDMER, Thomas 4800 Zofingen / CH | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 22152480.4 | 20.01.2022 | [2023/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4215665 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D06B23/20, D06B3/28 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
D06B23/20 (EP);
D06B3/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] |
Former [2023/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON TEXTILIEN MIT EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON TEXTILIEN | [2023/30] | English: | DEVICE FOR TREATING TEXTILES WITH A LIQUID AND METHOD FOR TREATING TEXTILES | [2023/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE TEXTILES AVEC UN LIQUIDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE TEXTILES | [2023/30] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 11.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US3977218 (ZUCCHINI GUIDO) [X] 1,2,7,8 * figure 1 * [A] 6 [I] 3-5,9-12; | [X]JP2002339225 (TOU KINRIN) [X] 1,7 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE202014102837U (CHANG CHI LUNG [TW]) [X] 1,7 * figure 2 *; | [X]US2015337471 (CHANG CHI-LUNG [TW]) [X] 1,2,7 * figure 1 *; | [X]KR101580805B (KYUNG HUN MACHINERY CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,5,7 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]CN209989564U (GUANGDONG JIANDA POLYESTER FIBRE TECH INDUSTRIAL CO LTD) [X] 1,7* figures 1-3 * |