EP4032791 - A PARCEL TRANSPORT CONTAINER, ASSEMBLY AND MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.08.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tennan, Ismail Jan de Greestraat 49-3 1067 HN Amsterdam / NL | [2024/41] |
Former [2022/30] | For all designated states BobbysBurgers Westzijde 50 1506 EG Zaandam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tennan, Khalid Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
Balali, Jamal Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
Tennan, Ismael Amsterdam / NL | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | van Breda, Jacobus Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2022/30] | Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 22152715.3 | 21.01.2022 | [2022/30] | Priority number, date | NL20212027366 | 22.01.2021 Original published format: NL 2027366 | [2022/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4032791 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62J9/28, B62J50/25, B62J9/30, G09F21/04, G09F9/35, G09F27/00 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
B62J9/28 (EP);
B62J50/25 (EP);
B62J9/30 (EP);
G09F21/048 (EP);
G09F27/005 (EP);
G09F9/35 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/30] | B62J9/28, B62J50/25, B62J9/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] |
Former [2022/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PAKETTRANSPORTBEHÄLTER, MONTAGE- UND ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/30] | English: | A PARCEL TRANSPORT CONTAINER, ASSEMBLY AND MONITORING SYSTEM | [2022/30] | French: | RÉCIPIENT DE TRANSPORT DE COLIS, SYSTÈME D'ASSEMBLAGE ET DE SURVEILLANCE | [2022/30] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 27.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU2001100070 (SKOOT LOGISTICS AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU]); | [A]CN201037020Y (QIUYAO SHEN [CN]); | [A]JP3151608U ; | [A]FR2979305 (MANZELLA JEAN EMMANUEL [FR]); | [A]US2014042200 (NAMANI EHSAN [GB]); | [I]EP3358521 (CHANG YOUNG CHEOL [KR]); | [A]WO2020002866 (SILVERSTONE DESIGN LTD [GB]); | [I]US10783559 (TRAN HA [US]); | [A]CN112233571 (SHENZHEN ZOYOH TECH CO LTD) |