EP4215759 - DIFFUSER FOR A RADIAL TURBOCOMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartmann, Jörg Paul 40489 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Wannek, Michael 42699 Solingen / DE | 03 /
Yildiz, Attilla 47447 Moers / DE | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 22153077.7 | 25.01.2022 | [2023/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4215759 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/44, F04D17/10 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
F04D29/444 (EP);
F04D17/10 (EP);
F05D2250/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIFFUSOR FÜR EINEN RADIALTURBOVERDICHTER | [2023/30] | English: | DIFFUSER FOR A RADIAL TURBOCOMPRESSOR | [2023/30] | French: | DIFFUSEUR POUR UN TURBOCOMPRESSEUR RADIAL | [2023/30] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/25] | 16.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH03134298 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,5-9 * abstract * * figure 11 *; | [X]DE69434033T (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-9 * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0057] ** figures 9,10 *; | [X]EP1860325 (ABB TURBO SYSTEMS AG [CH]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0025] * * figure 1 *; | [XI]JP2016176399 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,2,5-9 * abstract * * figures 1,4 * [I] 3,4; | [XI]CN107676305 (CHINA NORTH ENGINE RES INST TIANJIN) [X] 1-3,6-8 * abstract * * figures 1,2,3 * [I] 4 |