EP4036696 - TOUCH DEVICE, DRIVING METHOD THE SAME AND TOUCH SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hideep Inc. 3F., 49 Daewangpangyo-ro 644beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13493 / KR | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Seyeob Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
KIM, Bonkee Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
WOO, Hyoungwook Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
MOON, Hojun Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
LEE, Hwanhee Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
KIM, Jongsik Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
CHO, Youngho Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 22153496.9 | 26.01.2022 | [2022/31] | Priority number, date | KR20210013508 | 29.01.2021 Original published format: KR 20210013508 | KR20210169036 | 30.11.2021 Original published format: KR 20210169036 | [2022/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4036696 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/03, G06F3/044, G06F3/046 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
G06F3/04164 (EP,US);
G06F3/04162 (KR,US);
G06F3/0412 (CN,US);
G06F3/03545 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/038 (EP,US);
G06F3/0383 (KR);
G06F3/0416 (US);
G06F3/044 (KR);
G06F3/0442 (CN,US);
G06F3/0443 (EP);
G06F3/0445 (EP,US);
G06F3/0446 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/046 (EP,KR,US);
G06F2203/0384 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04102 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04106 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04107 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04111 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ANSTEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND BERÜHRUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/31] | English: | TOUCH DEVICE, DRIVING METHOD THE SAME AND TOUCH SYSTEM | [2022/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF TACTILE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ET SYSTÈME TACTILE | [2022/31] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 20.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP3657309 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [XAI]EP3739434 (WACOM CO LTD [JP]) |