EP4220322 - METHOD FOR GENERATING AN FTA FAULT TREE FROM AN FMEA TABLE OF A TECHNICAL SYSTEM OR VICE VERSA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ion Beam Applications Chemin du Cyclotron, 3 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [2024/32] |
Former [2023/31] | For all designated states Ion Beam Applications Chemin du Cyclotron, 3 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Menichelli, David 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | 02 /
Lämmerzahl, Andreas 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Icosa Europe Rue d'Oultremont 37 1040 Bruxelles / BE | [2024/32] |
Former [2023/31] | ABYOO Centre Monnet Avenue Jean Monnet 1 1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | Application number, filing date | 22153965.3 | 28.01.2022 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4220322 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4220322 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
G05B23/0278 (EP);
G16H40/60 (CN);
G06F11/079 (US);
G06F11/0793 (US);
G06F11/327 (US);
G06F16/9027 (CN);
G06Q10/0635 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/05] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES FTA-FEHLERBAUMS AUS EINER FMEA-TABELLE EINES TECHNISCHEN SYSTEMS ODER UMGEKEHRT | [2023/31] | English: | METHOD FOR GENERATING AN FTA FAULT TREE FROM AN FMEA TABLE OF A TECHNICAL SYSTEM OR VICE VERSA | [2023/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'UN ARBRE DE DÉFAILLANCE FTA À PARTIR D'UNE TABLE FMEA D'UN SYSTÈME TECHNIQUE OU VICE VERSA | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/05] | 28.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006077590 (FAVOWEB LTD [IL], et al); | [A]US2021406105 (KYMAL CHANDRAN [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1192543 | US9430311 | EP3270249 |