EP4053759 - MACHINE LEARNING PIPELINE SKELETON INSTANTIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAHA, Ripon Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | 02 /
PRASAD, Mukul R. San Jose, CA 95129 / US | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 22154233.5 | 31.01.2022 | [2022/36] | Priority number, date | US202117183724 | 24.02.2021 Original published format: US202117183724 | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053759 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N20/00, G06F8/36 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
G06N20/00 (EP,CN,US);
G06F8/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSTANZIIERUNG DES SKELETTS EINER PIPELINE FÜR MASCHINENLERNEN | [2022/36] | English: | MACHINE LEARNING PIPELINE SKELETON INSTANTIATION | [2022/36] | French: | INSTANCIATION DE SQUELETTE DE PIPELINE D'APPRENTISSAGE AUTOMATIQUE | [2022/36] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/33] | 31.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - Morgan Sean ET AL, "Building, automating, managing, and scaling ML workflows using Amazon SageMaker Pipelines | AWS Machine Learning Blog", (20210119), URL: https://aws.amazon.com/blogs/machine-learning/building-automating-managing-and-scaling-ml-workflows-using-amazon-sagemaker-pipelines/, (20220728), XP055947207 [I] 1-20 * page 1 - page 8 * | [A] - 10xai, "Reusable ML code snippets for everyday use - Part-I | by 10XAI | Analytics Vidhya | Medium", (20200107), URL: https://medium.com/analytics-vidhya/reusable-ml-code-snippets-for-everyday-use-part-i-f313903c2b37, (20220728), XP055947160 [A] 1-20 * page 1 - page 9 * | [A] - 10xai, "Reusable ML code snippets for everyday use - Part-II | by 10XAI | Analytics Vidhya | Medium", (20200121), URL: https://medium.com/analytics-vidhya/reusable-ml-code-snippets-for-everyday-use-part-ii-f5656a68f5dd, (20220728), XP055947162 [A] 1-20 * page 1 - page 8 * |