EP4043363 - CHILD RESISTANT AEROSOL ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WD-40 Manufacturing Company 9715 Businesspark Avenue San Diego, CA 92131 / US | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Starzman, Michael J. Jackson, WI 53037 / US | 02 /
Freudenberg, John W. Marysville, OH 43040 / US | 03 /
Bates, Kevin Victor Rushden NN10 6DQ / GB | 04 /
Krupp, Benjamin Thomas Wyoming, OH 45215 / US | 05 /
States, Robert Gerald Morrow, OH 45152 / US | 06 /
Parrot, David A. Cincinnati, OH 45223 / US | 07 /
Good, Robert J. Lee's Summit, MO 64081 / US | 08 /
Dodd, Joseph K. Lee's Summit, MO 64081 / US | 09 /
Falcon, Sara Dawson Richmond, VA 23225 / US | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 22154362.2 | 11.09.2018 | [2022/33] | Priority number, date | US201715701558 | 12.09.2017 Original published format: US201715701558 | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4043363 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/20, B65D83/22, B65D83/24, B65D83/30, B65D50/04, B05B11/00, B05B1/16 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
B65D83/20 (EP,US);
B05B1/1645 (EP,RU,US);
B05B11/1059 (RU,US);
B65D50/046 (US);
B65D83/22 (EP,RU,US);
B65D83/24 (US);
B65D83/30 (US);
B65D83/303 (EP,US);
B05B11/0094 (EP,US);
B65D2215/02 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] |
Former [2022/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KINDERSICHERER AEROSOLBETÄTIGER | [2022/33] | English: | CHILD RESISTANT AEROSOL ACTUATOR | [2022/33] | French: | ACTIONNEUR D'AÉROSOL À L'ÉPREUVE DES ENFANTS | [2022/33] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 17.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18857058.4 / EP3681819 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06134357 (TOA EIYO LTD) [A] 1-14 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2009242502 (QIN JACK JIE [US]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR3007299 (LINDAL FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-9b *; | [A]WO2015017306 (MSD CONSUMER CARE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14* figures 1a-4 * | by applicant | US6691896 | US6854619 | US7222754 | US7588171 | US8777061 |