EP4036005 - IMPROVED PYLON AND CARRIER PLATFORM PROVIDED WITH SUCH A PYLON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles - Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEPARDON, Bruno, Robert, François 78851 ELANCOURT / FR | 02 /
CALDERARA, Jérôme 33700 MERIGNAC / FR | 03 /
BERTHOU, Nicolas 92230 GENEVILLIERS / FR | 04 /
POMMEPUY, Renaud, Armand, Antoine 92230 GENEVILLIERS / FR | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 22154525.4 | 01.02.2022 | [2022/31] | Priority number, date | FR20210000976 | 02.02.2021 Original published format: FR 2100976 | [2022/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4036005 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4036005 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B64D1/02, B64D1/04, B64D7/00, B64D7/08 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
B64D1/02 (EP);
B64D1/04 (EP);
B64D7/00 (EP);
B64D7/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] |
Former [2022/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER MAST UND TRÄGERPLATTFORM, DIE MIT EINEM SOLCHEN MAST AUSGESTATTET IST | [2022/31] | English: | IMPROVED PYLON AND CARRIER PLATFORM PROVIDED WITH SUCH A PYLON | [2022/31] | French: | PYLÔNE AMÉLIORÉ ET PLATEFORME PORTEUSE ÉQUIPÉE D'UN TEL PYLÔNE | [2022/31] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 20.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012150365 (MAXWELL BARRY A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0054] *; | [A] - WANG YIMING ET AL, ""Combat Cloud-Fog" Network Architecture for Internet of Battlefield Things and Load Balancing Technology", 2018 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SMART INTERNET OF THINGS (SMARTIOT), IEEE, (20180817), doi:10.1109/SMARTIOT.2018.00054, pages 263 - 268, XP033400845 [A] 1-10 * page 263 - page 268 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SmartIoT.2018.00054 | [A] - MARCO ANTONIO SOTELO MONGE ET AL, "Conceptualization and cases of study on cyber operations against the sustainability of the tactical edge", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20210121), XP081863831 [A] 1-10 * page 1 - page 3 * | [A] - LYKE JIM ET AL, "Resilient Network Advanced Testbed (RESINATE) - A Radio Frequency/Optical Communications and Networking Testbed", 2019 IEEE AEROSPACE CONFERENCE, IEEE, (20190302), doi:10.1109/AERO.2019.8741758, pages 1 - 17, XP033561671 [A] 1-10 * page 1 - page 15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AERO.2019.8741758 |