EP4040583 - BATTERY PACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK On Co., Ltd. 26, Jong-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 03188 / KR | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Seung Hun 34124 Daejeon / KR | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 22154615.3 | 01.02.2022 | [2022/32] | Priority number, date | KR20210017770 | 08.02.2021 Original published format: KR 20210017770 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4040583 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4040583 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/204, H01M50/383, H01M50/367 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
H01M50/204 (EP,CN,KR);
H01M50/30 (KR);
H01M50/367 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/052 (CN);
H01M50/358 (KR);
H01M50/383 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/32] | H01M50/204, H01M50/35, H01M50/383 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] |
Former [2022/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEPACK | [2022/32] | English: | BATTERY PACK | [2022/32] | French: | BLOC-BATTERIE | [2022/32] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 24.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]DE102015014558 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,8 * paragraphs [0015] - [0017]; figure 1 * [A] 9-12 [Y] 13-15 [I] 5,6; | [Y]WO2018023050 (CRYNAMT MAN LLC [US]) [Y] 13-15 * paragraph [0069]; figure 1b * * paragraph [0071]; figure 2a *; | [A]CN112331992 (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [XP]EP3910699 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [XP] 1-4,7,8 * paragraphs [0073] , [0074]; figure 1 * | by applicant | US1329559 |