EP4027104 - METHOD FOR MEASURING A NUMERICALLY CONTROLLED MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DMG MORI Pfronten GmbH Deckel Maho-Straße 1 87459 Pfronten / DE | [2024/23] |
Former [2022/28] | For all designated states DECKEL MAHO Pfronten GmbH Deckel-Maho-Strasse 1 87459 Pfronten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAIER, Marzell 88316 Isny / DE | 02 /
MARCZINEK, Stefan 86983 Lechbruck / DE | 03 /
LOCHBIHLER, Thomas 6682 Vils / AT | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 22154947.0 | 20.12.2017 | [2022/28] | Priority number, date | DE201610226073 | 22.12.2016 Original published format: DE102016226073 | [2022/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4027104 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4027104 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01B21/04, G01B1/00, B23Q17/00 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
G01B21/042 (EP,KR,US);
B23Q1/52 (EP,KR,US);
B23Q17/22 (EP,KR,US);
G01B1/00 (EP,US);
G01B5/0002 (KR);
B23Q2717/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] |
Former [2022/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERMESSEN EINER NUMERISCH GESTEUERTEN WERKZEUGMASCHINE | [2022/28] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING A NUMERICALLY CONTROLLED MACHINE TOOL | [2022/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE D'UNE MACHINE-OUTIL À COMMANDE NUMÉRIQUE | [2022/28] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 13.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17823112.2 / EP3559594 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5111590 (PARK JOON-HO [KR]); | [A]DE19507805 (TRAPET EUGEN DR ING [DE]); | [YA]DE19611617 (HERKLOTZ HENRIK DIPL PHYS [DE]); | [XAYI]US2016138901 (KOSHIISHI HIKARU [JP]) | by applicant | EP1696289 | DE102010038783 |