EP4039620 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ROTARY DRIVE CURVED TRACK IN A CONVEYOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATS Automation Tooling Systems Inc. 730 Fountain St. N. Building 2 Cambridge, Ontario N3H 4R7 / CA | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hogan, Roger Cambridge / CA | 02 /
Lambert, Blake Robert Cambridge / CA | 03 /
Kleinikkink, Albert Cambridge / CA | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Wynne-Jones IP Limited Office 3.17 The Maltings East Tyndall Street Cardiff CF24 5EA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/32] | Wynne-Jones IP Limited Office 3.3 The Maltings East Tyndall Street Cardiff CF24 5EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 22155060.1 | 03.02.2022 | [2022/32] | Priority number, date | US202163145133P | 03.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163145133 P | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4039620 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65G35/06, B65G54/02 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
B65G54/02 (EP,US);
B65G35/06 (EP,US);
B65G21/22 (US);
B65G23/22 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] |
Former [2022/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM DREHANTRIEB EINER GEKRÜMMTEN BAHN IN EINEM FÖRDERSYSTEM | [2022/32] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ROTARY DRIVE CURVED TRACK IN A CONVEYOR SYSTEM | [2022/32] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENTRAÎNEMENT ROTATIF D'UNE VOIE EN COURBE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE CONVOYEUR | [2022/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 09.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2116222 (BODET JEAN) [X] 1,2,11-14 * figures 1-3 *; | [XI]EP0089543 (BENZ & HILGERS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,11-15 * figures 1,5 * [I] 2-5; | [I]US4619205 (STICHT WALTER [AT]) [I] 1,2,6,11-14 * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 14; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US8896241 (WERNERSBACH GLEN C [US], et al) [A] 1-15* column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]US2016221767 (KAMPS SEBASTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 1,11-15 * paragraphs [0031] , [32.33]; figures 1,2 * [I] 2-5,10; | [X]CA3104958 (PRODEL TECH [FR]) [X] 1,7-9,11-14 * page 10, line 29 - page 11, line 21; figures 6,7,22 * | by applicant | US8397896 |