EP4039870 - LAUNDRY TREATING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AN, Yongjun Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
YOON, Seongno Seoul 08592 / KR | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 22155141.9 | 04.02.2022 | [2022/32] | Priority number, date | KR20210017318 | 08.02.2021 Original published format: KR 20210017318 | KR20210017319 | 08.02.2021 Original published format: KR 20210017319 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4039870 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/08 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
D06F58/08 (EP);
D06F37/30 (CN);
D06F37/304 (EP,CN,US);
D06F37/206 (US);
D06F37/261 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] |
Former [2022/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSCHEBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/32] | English: | LAUNDRY TREATING APPARATUS | [2022/32] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DU LINGE | [2022/32] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 27.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4407078 (TAKEYAMA KOJIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,15 * column 2, line 39 - column 7, line 53; figure - * [A] 5-14; | [X]KR20200065932 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-4,15* paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0271]; figure - * | by applicant | KR20200065931 |