EP4047756 - SHIELD-TYPE CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Aviation Electronics Industry, Limited 21-1, Dogenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0043 / JP | [2024/11] |
Former [2022/34] | For all designated states Japan Aviation Electronics Industry, Limited 21-2, Dogenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0043 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAKI, Takashi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
NISHIMORI, Hiroto Tokyo / JP | 03 /
HIRANO, Tomoyuki Tokyo / JP | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 22155223.5 | 04.02.2022 | [2022/34] | Priority number, date | JP20210023659 | 17.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021023659 | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4047756 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4047756 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/6594, H01R13/6583, // H01R13/506 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H01R13/6583 (EP);
H01R13/6581 (CN,US);
H01R13/502 (CN);
H01R13/648 (CN);
H01R13/6594 (EP);
H01R13/506 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | H01R13/6594, H01R13/6583 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] |
Former [2022/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ABGESCHIRMTER VERBINDER | [2022/34] | English: | SHIELD-TYPE CONNECTOR | [2022/34] | French: | CONNECTEUR DE TYPE BOUCLIER | [2022/34] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 14.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5980320 (SLACK VICTOR EUGENE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * figures 1-4 * [I] 3,4,6-9; | [A]US6155872 (WU KUN-TSAN [TW]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US2009318025 (KAMEYAMA ISAO [JP]) [A] 1-9* abstract *; | [X]EP2827459 (HOSIDEN CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]EP3086416 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRON [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2005038725 |