EP4027014 - REFRIGERANT COMPRESSOR AND FREEZER INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIDA, Yoshinori Osaka-shi, Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
IIDA, Noboru Osaka-shi, Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
INAGAKI, Ko Osaka-shi, Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
KAWANO, Hiroyuki Osaka-shi, Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 22155442.1 | 16.11.2017 | [2022/28] | Priority number, date | JP20160224662 | 18.11.2016 Original published format: JP 2016224662 | JP20160225644 | 21.11.2016 Original published format: JP 2016225644 | [2022/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4027014 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4027014 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/00, F04B39/02 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
F04B39/0094 (EP);
F25B31/026 (US);
F04B39/023 (EP);
F04B2201/1207 (EP);
F04B2201/1209 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] |
Former [2022/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KÄLTEMITTELVERDICHTER UND GEFRIERGERÄT, DAS DIESEN EINSCHLIESST | [2022/28] | English: | REFRIGERANT COMPRESSOR AND FREEZER INCLUDING SAME | [2022/28] | French: | COMPRESSEUR FRIGORIFIQUE ET CONGÉLATEUR LE COMPRENANT | [2022/28] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 28.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17872369.8 / EP3543530 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5165870 (SATO SINOBU [JP]); | [A]JPH0893672 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]US6168403 (BUSH JAMES W [US]); | [A]JP2003003959 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]KR20040020557 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); | [A]JP2006002823 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]WO2007126230 (SAMSUNG KWANGJU ELECTRONICS CO [KR], et al); | [A]US2014294643 (KOYAMA MASAKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2015369526 (KAWANO HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]JP2016017475 (DAIKIN IND LTD) | by applicant | JPS554958B | JPH07238885 | JP2016003910 | JP2016003909 |