EP4228271 - MEDIA DATA TRANSMISSION AND PROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EVS Broadcast Equipment SA 13, Rue Bois St Jean 4102 Seraing / BE | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de Groot, Jan-Willem 5061LB Oisterwijk / NL | 02 /
Schut, Peter 5035HX Tilburg / NL | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Rossmanith, Manfred Bräutigamsweg 5 30974 Wennigsen / DE | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 22156004.8 | 09.02.2022 | [2023/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4228271 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/24, H04L1/22, H04L65/65, H04N21/242, H04N21/63, H04N21/643 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
H04N21/2402 (EP);
H04N21/64322 (EP,US);
H04L1/22 (EP);
H04L43/106 (US);
H04L65/65 (EP,US);
H04L65/80 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] |
Former [2023/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIENDATENÜBERTRAGUNGS- UND VERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES SOLCHEN SYSTEMS | [2023/33] | English: | MEDIA DATA TRANSMISSION AND PROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH SYSTEM | [2023/33] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION ET DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES MULTIMÉDIA ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN TEL SYSTÈME | [2023/33] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 08.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2020280750 (NAKAMURA KAZUNORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A] - KERO NIKOLAUS ET AL, "Enhanced Redundancy of ST 2059-2 Time Transfer Over ST 2022-7 Redundant Networks", SMPTE MOTION IMAGING JOURNAL, US, (20190701), vol. 128, no. 6, doi:10.5594/JMI.2019.2914964, ISSN 1545-0279, pages 21 - 29, XP055884938 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5594/JMI.2019.2914964 | [A] - KERO NIKOLAUS ET AL, "Performance and Reliability Aspects of Clock Synchronization Techniques for Industrial Automation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, vol. 107, no. 6, doi:10.1109/JPROC.2019.2915972, ISSN 0018-9219, (20190601), pages 1011 - 1026, (20190529), XP011725978 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2019.2915972 | by applicant | EP2870749 |